IL HB0357 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Procurement of Domestic Products Act. Provides that purchasing agencies shall promote the purchase of and give preference to manufactured articles, materials, and supplies that have been manufactured in Illinois (currently, the United States). Provides that, if the purchasing agency determines that certain conditions apply to a procured product, then, with respect to that procurement, the purchasing agency shall give preference to manufactured articles, materials, and supplies that have been manufactured in the United States. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROCURE DOMESTIC PRODUCTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2019
2019-05-15SenateDo Pass State Government; 006-003-000
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-05-14SenateWaive Posting Notice
2019-05-14SenateRe-assigned to State Government
2019-05-14SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
2019-05-10SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-07SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-24SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-24SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2019
2019-04-10SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-10HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 070-038-003
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2019-04-10HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2019-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-04-04HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lance Yednock
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-03-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2019-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-02-26HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2019-02-25HouseFiscal Note Filed
2019-02-19HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-02-19HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-14HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-004-000
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-18HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3051710Amended CodeCitation Text
3051725Amended CodeCitation Text
305175Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback