IL HB0356 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Procurement of Domestic Products Act. Provides that the term "manufactured in the United States" means: (1) in the case of products that are not assembled articles, materials, or supplies, that the product is mined or produced in the United States; (2) in the case of assembled articles, materials, or supplies, that design, final assembly, processing, packaging, testing, or other process that adds value, quality, or reliability occurs in the United States and the cost of domestic components exceeds 50% of the cost of all of the components; or (3) that the product is a commercially available off-the-shelf item (currently, "that design, final assembly, processing, packaging, testing, or other process that adds value, quality, or reliability occurs in the United States"). Provides for an exception to the Act if the price of the procured products manufactured in the United States exceeds the price of available and comparable procured products manufactured outside the United States by 12% or more (currently, if the price of the procured products manufactured in the United States exceeds the price of available and comparable procured products manufactured outside the United States by an unreasonable amount). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROCURE DOMESTIC PRODUCTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 71 N: 35 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-24SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-24SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2019
2019-04-10SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-04-09HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 071-035-001
2019-04-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2019-04-09HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2019-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-04-04HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-04-04HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-03-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2019-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-14HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-004-000
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-18HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3051710Amended CodeCitation Text
305175Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback