IL HB0355 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. With regard to a Professional Educator License renewal, provides that, beginning with the next 5-year renewal cycle after the effective date of the amendatory Act, no less than 15 of the 120 required hours of professional development must include training on inclusive practices in the classroom that examines instructional and behavioral strategies that improve academic and social-emotional outcomes for all students, with or without disabilities, in a general education setting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-EDU LIC RENEW-TRAINING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-18HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105521B-45Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback