IL HB0354 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the School Water Supply Testing Act. Provides that beginning January 1, 2018, water supplies available for drinking water use in all classroom-instruction public school facilities, non-home-based private school facilities, charter school facilities, and special education facilities shall be tested for lead at least once a year. Provides that water suppliers shall be responsible for such testing and associated expenses. Contains provisions concerning testing expenses, rate relief, and reimbursements. Provides that test results shall be public; provided to the school district or governing body of a tested school, and the Environmental Protection Agency; and published online by water suppliers. Creates the School Water Supply Testing Fund. Provides that any monies paid by the federal government to the State to test local school water shall be deposited into the Fund and such monies shall be used for the purposes set forth in the Act. Provides that the Agency may adopt rules concerning the Fund and to implement the Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCHOOL WATER SUPPLY TESTING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2017-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-02-07HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-02-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Environment
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback