IL HB0352 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Health Facilities Planning Act. Creates the South Suburban Trauma Center Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Provides for the deposit and use of moneys in the fund. Provides for duties of the Health Facilities and Services Review Board regarding a south suburban trauma center. Amends the Toll Highway Act. Provides for the use of specified toll revenue. Amends the State Finance Act to provide for the South Suburban Trauma Center Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
SOUTH SUBURBAN TRAUMA CENTER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | To Sales, Amusement, & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | To Sales, Amusement, & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3960 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.935 | New Code | See Bill Text |
605 | 10 | 40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=352&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0352.htm |