IL HB0351 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Assigned to Executive Committee
Pending: House Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the General Assembly Operations Act. Provides that no person may serve more than 10 consecutive years in any of the following leadership roles: Speaker of the House of Representatives, President of the Senate, Minority Leader of the House of Representatives, and Minority Leader of the Senate. Provides that the limitations imposed by the amendatory Act apply to service beginning on and after January 13, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GA LEADER TERM LIMITS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-18HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
25101.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback