IL HB0350 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Judicial Circuits Districting Act of 2022. Makes changes to the Judicial Circuits Districting Act of 2022 and the Circuit Courts Act to effectuate the intent of Public Act 102-693 by correcting drafting errors and making clarifications, while converting the remaining at-large judgeships in the 6th and 17th judicial circuits to resident judgeships similar to other circuits, including but not limited to, the 3rd and 19th judicial circuits. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM&TRAFFIC ASSESSMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2022-05-09 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-08 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2, 3 |
2022-04-08 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 039-018-000 |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Harmon |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Harmon |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-006-000 |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 8, 2022 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1) this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 108-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 135 | 5-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 135 | 5-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |