IL HB0350 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-9)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Downstate Teachers and State Universities Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Requires an employer to make an additional employer contribution for a participant whose earnings for any academic year used to determine the final rate of earnings exceed the amount of his or her earnings with the same employer for the previous academic year by more than 6% (instead of 3%). Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-EMPLOYER CONTRIBUTIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-04-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2019-04-12HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-03-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2019-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2019-02-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-14HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 006-003-001
2019-02-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2019-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2019-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-01-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-01-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2019-01-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2019-01-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-01-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2019-01-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-01-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40515-155Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-158Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback