IL HB0350 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0334
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Provides for the forfeiture of benefits for any person who otherwise would receive a survivor benefit who is convicted of any felony relating to or arising out of or in connection with the service of the member from whom the benefit results. Provides that all participants entering service after the effective date of the amendatory Act shall be deemed to have consented to that provision. Provides that the changes under the amendatory Act shall not impair any contract or vested right acquired by a survivor before the effective date of the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-FELONY FORFEITURE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-23 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-25HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0334
2017-08-25HouseEffective Date August 25, 2017
2017-08-25HouseGovernor Approved
2017-07-21HouseSent to the Governor
2017-06-23HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-23HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-23House3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 101-000-000
2017-05-29HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. David McSweeney
2017-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-28HouseArrived in House
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2017
2017-05-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000
2017-05-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-05-04SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-28SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-02-28SenateArrive in Senate
2017-02-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-02-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-02-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 013-000-000
2017-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40510-109Amended CodeCitation Text
40511-230Amended CodeCitation Text
40512-191Amended CodeCitation Text
40513-807Amended CodeCitation Text
40514-149Amended CodeCitation Text
40515-187Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-199Amended CodeCitation Text
40517-149.1Amended CodeCitation Text
40518-163Amended CodeCitation Text
4052-156Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-147Amended CodeCitation Text
4054-138Amended CodeCitation Text
4055-227Amended CodeCitation Text
4056-221Amended CodeCitation Text
4057-219Amended CodeCitation Text
4058-251Amended CodeCitation Text
4059-235Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback