IL HB0350 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0334
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0334
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Provides for the forfeiture of benefits for any person who otherwise would receive a survivor benefit who is convicted of any felony relating to or arising out of or in connection with the service of the member from whom the benefit results. Provides that all participants entering service after the effective date of the amendatory Act shall be deemed to have consented to that provision. Provides that the changes under the amendatory Act shall not impair any contract or vested right acquired by a survivor before the effective date of the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-FELONY FORFEITURE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-23 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0334 |
2017-08-25 | House | Effective Date August 25, 2017 |
2017-08-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-07-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-06-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-06-23 | House | House Concurs |
2017-06-23 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-06-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 101-000-000 |
2017-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-05-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2017 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2017-02-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2017-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 013-000-000 |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 10-109 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 11-230 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 12-191 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 13-807 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-149 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-187 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-199 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-149.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 18-163 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 2-156 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 3-147 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 4-138 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 5-227 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 6-221 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 7-219 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 8-251 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 9-235 | Amended Code | Citation Text |