IL HB0349 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-02 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Drug and Sharps Waste Stewardship Act. Directs the Environmental Protection Agency to administer a drug and sharps waste stewardship program. Provides that the State Board of Pharmacy is to guide and advise the Agency in its administration of the program. Requires covered entities to provide lists of covered and not covered products to the State Board and to implement stewardship plans. Requires stewardship plans to be submitted to the Agency for review and acceptance. Requires that all counties have at least one collection site for unused drugs and sharps per 50,000 people, and no fewer than 5 such collection sites. Requires counties that do not have the necessary number of collection sites to establish a mail-back program, or alternative collection program for covered products, or both. Imposes an administrative fee on covered entities. Provides penalties for covered entities that fail to comply with the provisions of the Act. Creates the Drug and Sharps Stewardship Fund and the Drug and Sharps Stewardship Penalty Account within the Fund. Directs the Agency to post lists of compliant covered entities on its website. Exempts stewardship programs already in existence under local ordinances at the time the Act takes effect from the Act's provisions, but provides that those entities with programs that are not within the Act's purview are not to receive any monetary support from the Drug and Sharps Stewardship Fund or the Drug and Sharps Stewardship Penalty Account. Exempts confidential proprietary information from public disclosure by the Agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DRUG AND SHARPS WASTE PROGRAM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2020-05-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-03-05HouseRe-assigned to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-02-13HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2019-01-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback