IL HB0339 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Salaries Act. Decreases the annual salary of the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, Secretary of State, Comptroller, Treasurer, and Attorney General by 10% beginning on January 9, 2019. Amends the General Assembly Compensation Act. Decreases the annual salary and committee service stipends of General Assembly members by 10% beginning on January 9, 2019 for each member of the House of Representatives and each member of the Senate elected to a 2-year term commencing January 11, 2017 and beginning January 9, 2019 for all other members of the Senate. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REDUCE GA & EXECUTIVE SALARIES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-10-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
251151Amended CodeCitation Text
52901Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback