IL HB0335 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Good Samaritan Act. Provides that any not-for-profit organization in this State, or any volunteer, employee, or other person present on the property of the organization in the area of the temporary or emergency shelter during the time temporary or emergency shelter is provided, who in good faith provides temporary or emergency shelter without fee for no more than 60 days or nights per year to a person experiencing homelessness shall not be liable for civil damages as a result of acts or omissions, except for gross negligence, in providing the temporary or emergency shelter. Limits the applicability of the new provisions to temporary or emergency shelters operated in Kankakee County. Provides that the provisions do not apply to an organization whose primary purpose is to provide shelter to persons experiencing homelessness.
Title
GOOD SAMARITAN-TEMP SHELTER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-02-08 | House | To Tort Liability Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-05 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=335&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0335.htm |