IL HB0335 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the River Edge Redevelopment Zone Act. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity may certify one additional pilot River Edge Redevelopment Zone in the City of Kankakee. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RIVER EDGE REDEVELOP-KANKAKEE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-02-24HouseTo Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee
2017-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-02-16HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-02-16HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Al Riley

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6511510-5.3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback