IL HB0333 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Finance Act. Provides that notwithstanding any provision of law to the contrary and to the extent permitted by federal law, for fiscal year 2017 and each fiscal year thereafter, outstanding liabilities as of June 30, payable from appropriations which have otherwise expired, may be paid out of the expiring appropriations only during the 2-month period ending at the close of business on August 31. Provides for an exception for a proper bill or invoice as defined by the State Prompt Payment Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FINANCE-APPROPRIATIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-09HouseTo Medicaid Subcommittee
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3010525Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback