IL HB0332 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Provides that, among other restrictions, no legislator may accept or participate in any way in any representation case before the State of Illinois or any unit of local government in this State on any matter filed on or after February 1, 2019 that involves a challenge to any tax or proposed assessment of any tax or fee. Provides that the prohibition against participation in such a representation case does not apply in regards to a person with whom the legislator maintains a close economic association, unless a fee or compensation received regarding any matter that involves a challenge to any tax or proposed assessment of any tax or fee is received by the legislator directly or indirectly through any interest in a partnership, limited liability corporation, or other business entity. Modifies the term "representation case" to include matters before a unit of local government. Effective immediately.
Title
GOV ETHICS-REPRESENTATION CASE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-02-08 | House | To Constitutional Law Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Grant Wehrli |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 420 | 1-113 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 2-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=332&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0332.htm |