IL HB0330 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Eliminates the requirement that a voter declare party affiliation when voting at a primary election. Provides that the voter shall receive the primary ballot of each of the established political parties nominating candidates for office at the primary election but may cast a ballot of only one political party, except in certain cases involving statewide political parties and political parties established only within a political subdivision. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-OPEN PRIMARY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-06HouseTo Ballot Access Subcommittee
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10519-12.1Amended CodeCitation Text
10519-2.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
10519-3Amended CodeCitation Text
10519-4Amended CodeCitation Text
10519-4.5New CodeSee Bill Text
10519-5Amended CodeCitation Text
10519-8Amended CodeCitation Text
10520-3Amended CodeCitation Text
10520-4.5New CodeSee Bill Text
10520-5Amended CodeCitation Text
10520-8Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-43Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-44Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback