IL HB0327 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Expands the fraud statute to include fraudulent schemes and artifices that do not include wire or mail transmission. Makes a conforming change in the Child Care Act of 1969.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-FRAUD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-16HouseTo Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
225104.2Amended CodeCitation Text
720517-24Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback