IL HB0324 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Prohibits the Speaker of the House of Representatives, President of the Senate, Minority Leader of the House of Representatives, and Minority Leader of the Senate from engaging in outside employment during their terms of office. Defines "outside employment". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GA MEMBERS-NO OTHER EMPLOYMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-16HouseTo Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
54203-108New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback