IL HB0323 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Lobbyist Registration Act. Expands the definition of lobbying to include communications with government employees and attempts to persuade local government officials. Pre-empts home rule authorities from defining the act of "lobbying" in a manner inconsistent with the State's definition. Prohibits family members of officials or State employees and persons with whom a legislator or State employee maintains a close economic relationship from lobbying for compensation. Provides that a violation of this prohibition is a Class A misdemeanor with a fine equal to 5 times the total compensation earned in violation of this Section.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOBBYIST-ECONOMIC ASSOCIATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-16HouseTo Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2517010Amended CodeCitation Text
251702Amended CodeCitation Text
251703Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback