IL HB0322 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that, after January 1, 2020, no non-home rule unit within the counties of Cook, DuPage, Kane, Lake, Madison, McHenry, St. Clair, and Will may enact or continue to enforce an ordinance for an automated traffic law enforcement system to enforce violations of intersection traffic control signals. Makes corresponding changes. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement from the State.
Title
VEH CD-REPEAL REDLIGHT CAMERAS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 22 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. David McSweeney |
2020-02-26 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. David McSweeney |
2020-02-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 084-004-005 |
2020-02-26 | House | 60 Votes Required |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Unlimited Debate |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2020-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2020-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2020-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2020-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2020-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2020-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nathan D. Reitz |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2020-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-05 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 011-000-000 |
2020-02-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2020-02-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2020-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2020-01-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-11-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-10-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-10-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-01-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 11-208 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-208.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |