IL HB0322 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Makes the gift ban apply to additional classes of persons. Places caps on gifts that may be accepted as exempt under the educational materials and missions exemption and the travel expenses for State business exemption. Deletes exemptions that authorize the acceptance of gifts provided by an individual on the basis of personal friendship; gifts made through bequests, inheritances, and other transfers at death; and gifts of food. Exempts from the gift ban the cost of food or beverages consumed at certain receptions, meals, and meetings. Establishes a procedure for the reporting of all gifts that are accepted as exempt from the gift ban. Authorizes the Secretary of State to institute a system for the reporting of accepted gifts. Increases penalties for violations of the gift ban.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ETHICS-GIFT BAN

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-16HouseTo Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
543010-10Amended CodeCitation Text
543010-15Amended CodeCitation Text
543010-20New CodeSee Bill Text
543050-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback