IL HB0320 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that a period of probation, a term of periodic imprisonment, or conditional discharge may not be imposed if the defendant is convicted of a Class 3 felony or higher violation of an offense involving the corruption of a public official when the offense consists of theft, fraud, extortion or a violation of the Official Misconduct or Public Contracts Article of the Criminal Code of 2012 and either: (1) the defendant was an elected official at the time of the offense, or (2) the offense involved more than $10,000 in money or property, based on either the value of any payments or the value of the item that was the object of the offense. Provides that this provision does not apply if the prosecutor certifies to the court at the time of sentencing that the defendant has provided substantial assistance in the case or another prosecution of substantial public importance.
Title
CD CORR-NONPROBATIONABLE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | To Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=320&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0320.htm |