IL HB0318 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 and the Unified Code of Corrections. Creates the offense of theft of public funds. Provides that a person commits the offense when he or she: (1) embezzles, steals, purloins, obtains by fraud, or knowingly converts to his or her use or the use of another, or without authority sells, conveys, or disposes of, any record, voucher, money, or thing of value of the State or any department or agency of the State, or of any unit of local government or school district, or any property made or being made under contract for the State or any department or agency of the State, or any unit of local government or school district; or (2) receives, conceals, or retains the record, voucher, money, thing of value, or property of the State or any department or agency of the State, or of any unit of local government or school district, or any property made or being made under contract for the State or any department or agency of the State, or any unit of local government or school district with intent to convert it to his or her use or gain, knowing it to have been embezzled, stolen, purloined, obtained by fraud, or converted. Establishes penalties based on the value of the property unlawfully obtained. Changes the statute concerning misapplication of funds. Includes embezzling, stealing, obtaining by fraud, or otherwise without authority knowingly converting to the use of any person other than the rightful owner or intentionally misapplying, property that is owned by, or is under the care, custody, or control of the State or of any agency of the State, a unit of local government, or school district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

THEFT-PUBLIC FUNDS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-16HouseTo Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720516-1.4New CodeSee Bill Text
720533E-16Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-5-3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback