IL HB0312 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that, notwithstanding any other provision of law to the contrary, a school board may immediately suspend or terminate the employment of any person employed by a school district or contracted to work for a school district who has been convicted of a sex offense; defines "sex offense". Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-EMPLOYEE-SEX OFFENSE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | To Special Issues Subcommittee (ESS) |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-01-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.69 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.61 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=312&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0312.htm |