IL HB0312 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nurse Practice Act. In provisions concerning scope of practice, written collaborative agreements, temporary practice with a collaborative agreement, prescriptive authority with a collaborative agreement, titles, advertising, continuing education, and reports relating to professional conduct and capacity, changes references of "advanced practice nurse" and "APN" to "advanced practice registered nurse" and "APRN". Provides that a written collaborative agreement is required for all postgraduate advanced practice registered nurses until specific requirements have been met. Provides that postgraduate advanced practice registered nurses may enter into written collaborative agreements with collaborating advanced practice registered nurses or physicians (rather than collaborating physicians or podiatric physicians). In provisions concerning prescriptive authority for postgraduate advanced practice registered nurses, sets forth the requirements for postgraduate advanced practice registered nurses to have prescriptive authority and the limitations of such authority. Defines "full practice authority" and provides requirements for it to be granted to an advanced practice registered nurse. Removes provisions concerning advanced practice nursing in hospitals, hospital affiliates, or ambulatory surgical treatment centers, except the provision for anesthesia services and the provision requiring advanced practice registered nurses to provide services in accordance with other Acts. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
NURSES-APRN SCOPE OF PRACTICE
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Rep. Cynthia Soto [D] | Rep. Theresa Mah [D] | Rep. Anna Moeller [D] |
Rep. Barbara Currie [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 013-000-000 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 65 | 15-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 15-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 15-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 15-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 15-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 15-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 15-55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 65-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 65-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 65-35.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 65-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 65-43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 65 | 65-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 65-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 65-55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 65-60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 65-65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |