IL HB0311 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
Pending: House Judiciary - Criminal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Freedom of Information Act to provide that in the case of sexual assault or sexual abuse by school district personnel, nothing in the Act prohibits a school district from disclosing disciplinary records of school district personnel. Amends the School Code to require a school board to report all credible cases of sexual assault or sexual abuse by a licensed educator to the State Board of Education, to establish a hearing procedure for student victims, and to ensure that a licensed educator under investigation by the State Superintendent of Education is reassigned to non-classroom duty. Provides that, beginning with the 2019-2020 school year, the State Board of Education must monitor all fingerprint-based criminal history records checks and any other database checks conducted by a school district or regional superintendent for applicants for employment with a school district. Makes changes concerning educator licensure and allegations of physical or sexual abuse. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 to create the criminal offense of sexual conduct or sexual relations with a student by an authority figure. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963 to require an arresting enforcement agency to share its reports pertaining to the arrest of a licensed educator with the superintendent of any school district that employs the educator (or, in the case of the arrest of a superintendent, with the school board of any school district that employs the superintendent). Amends the Personnel Record Review Act to provide that the Act does not prohibit a school district from divulging internal investigative findings and discipline to another school district. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-SEXUAL ASSAULT/ABUSE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-02-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-02-04HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-02-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-01-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-01-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-10HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-21.9Amended CodeCitation Text
105510-30New CodeSee Bill Text
105521B-15Amended CodeCitation Text
105521B-75Amended CodeCitation Text
105521B-80Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-18.5Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-18.61New CodeSee Bill Text
105534-84bAmended CodeCitation Text
51407.7New CodeSee Bill Text
720511-9.6New CodeSee Bill Text
7255107-17New CodeSee Bill Text
820407Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback