IL HB0309 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Motion Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Sex Offender Registration Act. Provides that a registered sex offender who loses his or her employment must report in person to the law enforcement agency with whom he or she last registered his or her loss of employment within 3 days of that loss of employment. Provides that an out-of-state employee must notify the agency having jurisdiction, in writing, of his or her loss of employment within 3 days of the loss.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SEX OFFENDER REG-LOSS- EMPLOY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-30HouseMotion Tabled
2017-05-30HouseMotion Prevailed
2017-05-30HouseMotion Discharge Committee Tabled
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-23HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-02-16HouseTo Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-10HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7301506Amended CodeCitation Text
7301506-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback