IL HB0308 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-16 - To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person who has been issued a currently valid Firearm Owner's Identification Card may transport in a vehicle an accessible rifle, shotgun, or other long gun without the weapon being broken down in a non-functioning state or without the weapon being enclosed in a case, firearm carrying box, shipping box, or other container if the firearm is unloaded.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-FIREARM TRANSPORT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-16HouseTo Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
2017-02-16HouseTabled
2017-02-16HouseMotion Prevailed
2017-02-10HouseMotion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-02-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-10HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720524-1Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-1.6Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback