IL HB0308 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0001
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0001
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Budget Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Governor's submission of the State budget.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-02-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-02-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-02-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-17 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0001 | |
2009-02-17 | Effective Date February 17, 2009 | |
2009-02-17 | Governor Approved | |
2009-02-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-02-11 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-02-11 | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 | |
2009-02-10 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 11, 2009 | |
2009-02-10 | Second Reading | |
2009-02-10 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2009 | |
2009-02-10 | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 | |
2009-02-10 | Assigned to Judiciary | |
2009-02-10 | Waive Posting Notice | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-06 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-02-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-02-06 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-02-05 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 | |
2009-02-05 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-05 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gary Hannig | |
2009-02-04 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-04 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-04 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-04 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 | |
2009-02-04 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-02-04 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee | |
2009-01-27 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-01-23 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-01-23 | First Reading | |
2009-01-23 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |