IL HB0305 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that public funds shall not be expended by a municipality for expenses connected with a convention or gathering of municipal personnel. Provides that a State agency may not expend public funds for expenses connected with the renting or procurement of booths, hospitality suites, or other physical spaces at a convention or gathering of municipal personnel. Provides that a "convention or gathering of municipal personnel" means a gathering of employees or contractors from 2 or more separately domiciled or geographically separated municipalities in a gathering that is sponsored or co-sponsored by a league or association that includes 2 or more municipalities. Provides that the restrictions do not apply to public funds expended at a convention or gathering of public safety personnel, at a convention or gathering relating to economic development and tourism promotion, pursuant to a contract entered into before the effective date of the amendatory Act, or funds appropriated and expended by a municipality if specified procedures are followed. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUNICIPAL CONVENTION EXPENSES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee
2019-02-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2019-01-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-01-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-10HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6558-1-2.7New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback