IL HB0305 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0467
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0467
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that the requirement that a police applicant possess an associate's degree may also be waived if the applicant has successfully received credit for a minimum of 60 credit hours toward a bachelor's degree from an accredited college or university (currently, this requirement may be waived only if the applicant has served for 24 months of active duty or 180 days combat duty in the United States Armed Forces). Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI-PD COLLEGE REQUIREMENTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-23 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-08 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0467 |
2017-09-08 | House | Effective Date September 8, 2017 |
2017-09-08 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-07-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-06-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-06-23 | House | House Concurs |
2017-06-23 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-06-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 101-000-000 |
2017-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2017-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-05-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Barickman |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2017 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 008-000-000 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-02-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 013-000-000 |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 10-2.1-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |