IL HB0305 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0467
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that the requirement that a police applicant possess an associate's degree may also be waived if the applicant has successfully received credit for a minimum of 60 credit hours toward a bachelor's degree from an accredited college or university (currently, this requirement may be waived only if the applicant has served for 24 months of active duty or 180 days combat duty in the United States Armed Forces). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUNI-PD COLLEGE REQUIREMENTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-23 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-08HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0467
2017-09-08HouseEffective Date September 8, 2017
2017-09-08HouseGovernor Approved
2017-07-21HouseSent to the Governor
2017-06-23HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-23HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-23House3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 101-000-000
2017-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-28HouseArrived in House
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-05-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Barickman
2017-05-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 009-000-000
2017-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
2017-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2017-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2017
2017-05-10SenateDo Pass Local Government; 008-000-000
2017-05-09SenateWaive Posting Notice
2017-05-05SenatePostponed - Local Government
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-03-20SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-02-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-28SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2017-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-02-28SenateArrive in Senate
2017-02-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-02-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 013-000-000
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-10HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
65510-2.1-6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback