IL HB0303 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-17)
Status: Enrolled on June 23 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that it is an aggravating factor in sentencing that the defendant committed the offense of driving while under the influence of alcohol, other drug or drugs, intoxicating compound or compounds or any combination thereof in violation of the Illinois Vehicle Code or a similar provision of a local ordinance and the defendant during the commission of the offense was driving his or her vehicle upon a roadway designated for one-way traffic in the opposite direction of the direction indicated by official traffic control devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CD CORR-AGGRAVATING FACTOR-DUI

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-23 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-21HouseSent to the Governor
2017-06-23HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-23HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 100-001-000
2017-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-06-22HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-000-000
2017-06-20HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-05-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-05-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-05-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-05-31HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-05-31HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-31HouseArrived in House
2017-05-31SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon
2017-05-31SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2017-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2017
2017-05-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 26, 2017
2017-05-25SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-24SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2017-03-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-01SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 1, 2017
2017-02-28SenateArrive in Senate
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-02-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-007-000
2017-02-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-10HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73055-5-3.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback