IL HB0303 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0478
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0478
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Defines "severance agreement". Provides that a severance agreement that is funded in whole or part by public moneys or that releases a claim against a public body shall not require or impose any condition on any party to keep allegations, evidence, settlement amounts, or any other information confidential, except that which is necessary to protect a trade secret, proprietary information, or information that is otherwise exempt from disclosure under the Act. Provides that the new provisions do not apply to agreements signed before the effective date of the amendatory Act.
Title
FOIA-SEVERANCE AGREEMENTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0478 |
2015-09-10 | House | Effective Date June 1, 2016 |
2015-09-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-07-30 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-07-01 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-000 |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As July 1, 2015 |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As June 30, 2015 |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading June 23, 2015 |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 30, 2015 |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Executive |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-002-000 |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2015-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2015-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2015-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-11 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-000-000 |
2015-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2015-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2015-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2015-02-13 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2015-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2015-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 2.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |