IL HB0299 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
Pending: Senate Licensed Activities And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Universities Article of the Illinois Pension Code. In a provision concerning return to work by an affected annuitant, provides that a person who becomes an affected annuitant remains an affected annuitant, except for any period on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act during which an annuitant received an annualized retirement annuity that is less than $10,000. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-SURS-RETURN TO WORK

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-28SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-02-28SenateArrive in Senate
2017-02-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-001
2017-02-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 013-000-000
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-10HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40515-139.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback