IL HB0294 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Revenue Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Director of Revenue shall publish a list containing the name of each member of the General Assembly who (i) has been issued a notice of failure to file a return under the Illinois Income Tax Act more than 180 prior to the date the list is published and (ii) has not filed a return as provided in that notice by the date the list is published. Provides that, if a member of the General Assembly whose name appears on the list subsequently brings himself or herself into compliance with the reporting requirements of the Illinois Income Tax Act, or if that member demonstrates that his or her name appeared on the list in error, then the Director shall promptly remove that member's name from the list. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-GA MEMBERS-DISCLOSURE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=294&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0294.htm |