IL HB0294 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the County Board of Election Commissioners Article of the Election Code. Provides that commissioners appointed under the provisions of that Article shall serve in an unpaid capacity. Effective immediately.
Title
ELEC CD-CNTY BD OF ELEC
Sponsors
Rep. David Olsen [R] | Rep. Jeanne Ives [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-03-06 | House | To Election Administration Subcommittee |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 6A-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=294&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0294.htm |