IL HB0293 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the General Assembly Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Restricts participation in the General Assembly Retirement System by members of the General Assembly to persons who become participants before January 1, 2018 and provides that, beginning on that date, the System shall not accept any new participants who are members of the General Assembly. Makes related changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-GARS-NO NEW GA MEMBERS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-01-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-01-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-01-18HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Steven Reick
2017-01-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2017-01-13HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tim Butler
2017-01-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-01-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-10HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4052-101Amended CodeCitation Text
4052-105Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback