IL HB0292 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-30 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-30 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that over-the-counter medications that are prescribed to a recipient of medical assistance by a physician, a physician assistant, a nurse practitioner, or any other medical care provider qualified to prescribe medications shall be covered under the State's medical assistance program. Provides that pharmacies providing prescribed over-the-counter medications shall be reimbursed at the same rate determined by the Department of Healthcare and Family Services for prescription medications covered under the State's medical assistance program. Requires the Department to establish guidelines and standards by administrative rule on the documentation, if any, a medical care provider must submit when prescribing an over-the-counter medication to a recipient of medical assistance. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-OTC MEDICATIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | House | Tabled |
2017-05-30 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-03-09 | House | To Medicaid Subcommittee |
2017-02-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen |