IL HB0291 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Assigned to Human Services Committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Water Quality Assurance Act. Provides that new and existing health care facilities and buildings containing health care facilities shall develop and implement water management programs with specified elements to control the growth and spread of opportunistic pathogens. Requires specified persons to develop and implement a routine culture sampling plan for all building water systems. Requires health care facilities to perform remediation of identified opportunistic pathogens. Provides that the Department of Public Health or agent health departments may enter at reasonable times upon private or public property for the purpose of inspecting and investigating conditions relating to the enforcement of the Act. Requires health care facilities to register with the Department all building water systems within 120 days of the Act's effective date and to provide specified information. Contains other provisions. Establishes the Water Quality Assurance Fund as a special fund in the State treasury and makes a conforming change in the State Finance Act. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall implement, administer, and enforce the Act and may adopt rules it deems necessary to do so. Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that the Code shall not apply to procurement expenditures necessary for the Department to respond to an infectious disease outbreak response or to procurement expenditures that are necessary for a State agency's facility to implement critical recommendations provided by the Department in response to an infectious disease outbreak. Effective January 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WATER QUALITY ASSURANCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2021-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-01-29HouseFirst Reading
2021-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.935New CodeSee Bill Text
305001-10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback