IL HB0291 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits improper disclosure of location information of a public official or human service provider when he or she knowingly obtains and discloses to any other person the location information of a public official or human service provider. Provides that a person commits improper disclosure of personal information of a public official or human service provider when he or she knowingly obtains and discloses to any other person the personal information of a public official or human service provider. Provides that improper disclosure of location information of a public official or human service provider is a Class A misdemeanor for a first offense and a Class 4 felony for a second or subsequent offense. Provides that improper disclosure of personal information of a public official or human service provider is a Class 4 felony for a first offense and a Class 3 felony for a second or subsequent offense. Provides that is not a violation to disclose the business address or place of work of a public official or human service provider. Defines terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INFORM DISCLOSURE-PUB OFFICIAL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-19HouseTo Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-01-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-01-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-10HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720549-7New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback