IL HB0290 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0057
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0057
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. In provisions concerning the Prioritization of Urgency of Need for Services database, requires the State Board of Education, in consultation with the Department of Human Services, through school districts, to provide to parents and guardians of students a copy of the Department of Human Services' guide titled "Understanding PUNS: A Guide to Prioritization for Urgency of Need for Services" each year at the annual review meeting for the student's individualized education program (rather than requiring the State Board of Education, in consultation with the Department of Human Services, to inform parents and guardians of students through school districts about the Prioritization of Urgency of Need for Services waiting list). Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-SPECIAL ED RESOURCES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0057 |
2021-07-09 | House | Effective Date July 9, 2021 |
2021-07-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 011-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-04-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 023-000-000 |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2021-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2021-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2021-03-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 023-000-000 |
2021-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer |