IL HB0290 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Beginning June 1, 2010, provides that when a vacancy in nomination occurs on or after the general primary but more than 90 days before certification of candidates for the general election ballot, other than because no candidate's name appeared on the general primary ballot and no write-in candidate was nominated, the vacancy may be filled only at a special primary election on a date set by the State Board of Elections but at least 30 days before the date of certification. Beginning June 1, 2010, permits a vacancy in nomination occurring less than 91 days before certification of candidates for the general election ballot but more than 15 days before the general election to be filled by the political party's nominating committee only if the vacancy is due to the candidate's death or incapacitating illness. Beginning June 1, 2010, adds inability to fulfill the duties of the office sought due to illness as an event creating a vacancy in nomination. (Now, a vacancy in nomination occurring on or after the general primary and before the 15th day before the general election is filled by the party's nominating committee by certain deadlines based upon when the vacancy occurs).
Title
ELECTIONS-NOMINATION VACANCY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-09 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-01-23 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-01-23 | First Reading | |
2009-01-22 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=290&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0290.htm |