IL HB0288 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Makes changes to provide that any person who knowingly files an application to vote, accepts a ballot, or enters a voting machine on more than one occasion on the same election day where the ballot or machine lists any of the same candidates and issues (except to legally give assistance, to replace a spoiled or rejected ballot, or at the direction of a judge of elections) shall be guilty of a Class 3 felony. Makes changes to provide that any person who knowingly makes a false statement, material to the issue or point in question, in any affidavit, certificate, or sworn oral declaration required by any provision of the Code shall be guilty of a Class 3 felony. Provides that an indictment or information for perjury alleging that the offender has knowingly made contradictory statements, material to the issue or point in question, in affidavits, certificates, or sworn oral declarations required by any provision of the Code need not specify which statement is false. Provides that at the trial, the prosecution need not establish which statement is false. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-VIOLATIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-06HouseTo Election Administration Subcommittee
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2017-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-10HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10529-10Amended CodeCitation Text
10529-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback