IL HB0287 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that each property tax bill shall contain a separate statement for each of the taxing districts setting forth the dollar amount of tax due that will be used by the taxing district to pick up or otherwise pay its employees' contributions to a public pension fund. Provides that each taxing district that picks up or otherwise pays its employees' contributions to a public pension fund must certify this information to the county clerk on or before the last Tuesday in December. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-TAX BILLS-PENSION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-01-24HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2018-01-24HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-13HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-02-24HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-01-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-10HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520018-17New CodeSee Bill Text
3520020-15Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback