IL HB0286 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides that, notwithstanding any other provision of law to the contrary, whenever an election authority is required to publish or post information to the public, the election authority may satisfy that requirement by publishing via a newspaper or on its website. Amends the Counties Code. Provides that, notwithstanding any other provision of law to the contrary, whenever a county clerk is required to publish or post election information to the public, the clerk may satisfy that requirement by publishing via a newspaper or on its website. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-ONLINE PUBLISHING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 016-000-000
2017-03-30HouseRemains in Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2017-03-30HouseMotion Do Pass - Lost Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 007-002-000
2017-03-30HouseReported Back To Elections & Campaign Finance Committee;
2017-03-30HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 004-000-000
2017-03-06HouseTo Voter Education & Registration Subcommittee
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-09HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1051-25New CodeSee Bill Text
5553-2020New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback