IL HB0285 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Creates an open-primary system. Provides that primary ballots shall list each candidate for office, regardless of party affiliation, participating in the primary election. Provides that the 2 candidates in any primary that received the most votes in the primary election, regardless of party affiliation of the candidates, shall be the only 2 candidates certified for participation in the general election. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-TOP TWO PRIMARY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-06HouseTo Ballot Access Subcommittee
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-09HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10519-12.1Amended CodeCitation Text
10519-3Amended CodeCitation Text
10519-4.5New CodeSee Bill Text
10519-5Amended CodeCitation Text
10519-8Amended CodeCitation Text
10520-3Amended CodeCitation Text
10520-4Amended CodeCitation Text
10520-4.5New CodeSee Bill Text
10520-5Amended CodeCitation Text
10520-8Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-10Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-2Repealed CodeCitation Text
1057-3Repealed CodeCitation Text
1057-43Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-44Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-60Amended CodeCitation Text
105Art. 10Repealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback