IL HB0284 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0333
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0333
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that when the Department of Transportation enters into a contract under the Code that provides for mobilization payments and the contractor is using the services of a subcontractor, the subcontract shall include terms requiring mobilization payments be made to the subcontractor. Provides for a schedule of mobilization payments based on the initial value of the subcontract. Defines "mobilization payment".
Title
PROCUREMENT-MOBILIZATION PAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 32 N: 20 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 78 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 78 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0333 |
2017-08-25 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 032-020-000 |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-02-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 078-032-002 |
2017-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-09 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |