IL HB0282 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Abortion Law of 1975. Provides that a person may not perform an abortion of a fetus solely because of the fetus's race, color, national origin, ancestry, sex, or diagnosis or potential diagnosis of the fetus having Down syndrome or any other disability. Provides that at least 18 hours before an abortion is performed on a pregnant woman whose fetus is diagnosed with a lethal fetal anomaly, the physician who will perform the abortion shall: (1) orally and in person, inform the pregnant woman of the availability of perinatal hospice services; and (2) provide the pregnant woman copies of the perinatal hospice brochure developed by the Department of Public Health and the list of perinatal hospice providers and programs by printing the perinatal hospice brochure and list of perinatal hospice providers from the Department's Internet web site. Provides that the Department shall adopt rules within 90 days after the effective date of the bill to implement these provisions. Provides that the report of abortions submitted to the Department shall include the gender of the fetus, if detectable; and whether the fetus has been diagnosed with or has a potential diagnosis of having Down syndrome or any other disability. Provides that a person who knowingly or intentionally performs an abortion in violation of these provisions may be subject to: (1) disciplinary sanctions under the Medical Practice Act of 1987; and (2) civil liability for wrongful death. Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987 to make conforming changes. Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that it is unlawful discrimination under the Act to perform an abortion solely because of the race, color, sex, disability, national origin, or ancestry of the fetus. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ABORTION-LIMITATIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseTo Informed Consent Subcommitee
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-01-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-09HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2256022Amended CodeCitation Text
72051010Amended CodeCitation Text
72051011Amended CodeCitation Text
7205103.2New CodeSee Bill Text
7205103.3New CodeSee Bill Text
7205103.4New CodeSee Bill Text
77551-103Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback